HI HB2404 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstate the President of the University of Hawaii as the chief procurement officer for contracts for construction and construction related professional services furnished by licensees under chapter 464, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Procurement For The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2831 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - Act 042, 06/12/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1142).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2404&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2404_.HTM |