HI HB2395 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 066, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Act 066, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Taxation to require certain taxpayers to file returns electronically, subject to exceptions for reasonable cause. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Electronic Filing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Act 066, 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167). |
2018-07-05 | House | Act 066, on 06/29/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2018-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-18 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Ing, McDermott, McKelvey excused (4). |
2018-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 618). |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-18-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-27-18. |
2018-04-17 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; English Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Tupola. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 388). |
2018-03-27 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 444) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-23-18. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3025) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 223). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2822 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36