HI HB2392 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Act 005, 04/12/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Act 005, 04/12/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation for coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic mitigation, including vaccination response activities. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Act 005, 04/12/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105). |
2022-04-13 | House | Act 005, on 04/12/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 575). |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-04-12 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 515). |
2022-04-08 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-30-22. |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Governor re: Recommended for Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 17). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 371). |
2022-03-30 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 557) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) DeCoite). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-22. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3513) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-23-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3238) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-14 | House | Received from Governor re: Expeditious Consideration (Gov. Msg. No. 12). |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 86). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHH with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 162-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHH. |
2022-02-03 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Thursday, 02-03-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to PDP, HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |