HI HB239 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, in the case of any multiple-page advertisement, for the required disclosures to be made on the first page of the advertisement or on the cover page of the publication if the advertisement is used as the lead article and displayed on the cover page of a state- or county-wide distributed publication. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Campaign Advertisements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Ward. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB239 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.