HI HB2388 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development to establish, implement, and maintain an interactive website that is accessible by the public at no cost and provides notification of and opportunity for participation in actions taken pursuant to the State's environmental review process. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2100. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Impact Statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 181-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-08-22 8:50AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Environmental Assessments
Environmental Impact Statements
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Public Records
Environmental Assessments
Environmental Impact Statements
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Public Records