HI HB2382 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 229, Session Laws of Hawaii 2014, to make the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism the State's liaison to the Pacific-Asia Institute for Resilience and Sustainability. (HB2382 HD1)
Title
Pacific-Asia Institute for Resilience and Sustainability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-09 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-09-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2911 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to TSI/EET, WAM.