HI HB238 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes persons 21 years of age or older to possess or use limited amounts of cannabis for recreational purposes. Authorizes the licensing, regulation, and taxation of cannabis cultivation, manufacturing, testing, and retail sales facilities. Specifies that only existing medical cannabis dispensary licensees may apply for licensure as a cannabis establishment, but may be permitted to establish additional retail dispensing locations. Allocates an unspecified percentage of general excise tax revenues derived from retail cannabis sales transactions to the counties. Specifies the application and non-application of the Internal Revenue Code to expenses related to the production and sale of cannabis and cannabis products for state income tax purposes. Amends certain provisions of the penal code relating to offenses involving marijuana and expands the affirmative defense to prosecution to include persons acting in accordance with the new part in Chapter 329, HRS, created by Section 2 of this Act. Repeals limitations on authorized sources of medical cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cannabis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseRe-referred to HHH, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback