HI HB2378 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires counties to expedite demolition permits for vacant and abandoned residential homes. Allows the department of taxation to seek sale of the property through nonjudicial foreclosure of vacant and abandoned residential properties with outstanding recorded state tax liens at any time after establishing vacancy and abandonment. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Vacant And Abandoned Residential Structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Nakashima, Say. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20 at 2:00PM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |