HI HB2377 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 188, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 188, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes training options as part of vocational rehabilitation for injured employees when training for employment in another occupational field is required for the employee and as part of the employee's rehabilitation plan. Provides that all professional and clerical employees of the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations Rehabilitation Unit are to be administered by the DLIR Director. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | House | Act 188, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297). |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 188, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1297). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Keohokalole, McDermott excused (2). |
2018-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 678). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 673). |
2018-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18. |
2018-04-25 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; English Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Holt Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 718) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to LBR. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 221). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 944-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 436-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-12-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 171-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2804 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to LBR.