HI HB2370 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "beer" to specify an alcohol by volume of no less than 0.5 per cent and to include alcohol seltzer beverages. Takes effect 1/1/2023.
Title
Relating To Alcohol.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2331 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2370&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2370_.HTM |