HI HB237 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRN, EDN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school buses imported into Hawaii after June 30, 2018, to have seat belt assemblies and school bus contracts to require seat belt assemblies in all school buses by July 1, 2028. Applies only to school buses with gross vehicle weight of over 10,000 pounds. Requires DOT and DOE to adopt applicable rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To School Buses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-23HouseReferred to TRN, EDN, referral sheet 1
2017-01-20HousePass First Reading
2017-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback