HI HB235 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 207, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of "victim" in the victim restitution law to include certain duly incorporated humane societies or duly incorporated societies for the prevention of cruelty to animals for the purpose of receiving restitution except where restitution has already been contracted for by the counties or State. (HB235 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victim Restitution; Humane Society

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-02SenateAct 207, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
2013-07-02HouseAct 207, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
2013-05-06HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 19).
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 19) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
2013-04-19HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 10:40AM in conference room 224.
2013-04-18HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 10:30AM in conference room 224.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wooley, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Har, Thielen.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 482) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-04-05SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to JDL.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 195).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
2013-02-28HouseDeferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
2013-02-28HouseReported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 719) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Evans, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, C. Lee.
2013-02-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, C. Lee.
2013-02-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to JUD/CPC, referral sheet 2
2013-01-18HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-17HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback