HI HB235 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establish a new chapter in the Hawaii Revised Statutes to authorize the creation of and establish policies and procedures for the governance of sustainable business limited liability companies. Effective July 1, 2112. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sustainable Business Limited Liability Companies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-20 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 423.
2011-04-19 (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 1:30PM in conference room 423.
2011-04-18 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644).
2011-04-18 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Wakai.
2011-04-18 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584).
2011-04-15 (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Yamane, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Brower, Kawakami, Marumoto.
2011-04-15 (H) Re-referred to ERB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 58
2011-04-13 (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 407).
2011-04-12 (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2011-04-11 (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 407) in amended form (SD 2).
2011-04-08 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). Transmitted to House.
2011-04-06 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-11.
2011-04-06 (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1058) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2011-04-01 (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green, Solomon.
2011-03-24 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2011-03-24 (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2011-03-24 (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2011-03-23 (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2011-03-21 (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-23-11 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2011-03-16 (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 03-21-11 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2011-03-11 (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-11 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2011-03-10 (S) Referred to EDT, CPN.
2011-03-10 (S) Passed First Reading.
2011-03-10 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 61).
2011-03-08 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, Ching, Johanson, Marumoto, Riviere, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Pine, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Saiki excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2011-03-04 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11.
2011-03-04 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 693) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2011-03-01 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Riviere; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
2011-02-26 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308.
2011-02-24 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
2011-02-22 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-11 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2011-02-18 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
2011-02-18 (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2011-02-15 (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Pine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2011-02-11 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-15-11 11:15AM in conference room 312.
2011-02-10 (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-15-11.
2011-02-08 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 02-10-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312.
2011-01-24 (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 1
2011-01-24 (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading.
2011-01-21 (H) Pending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback