HI HB235 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Port Authority. Empowers the Authority to administer a statewide system of harbors and airports. Establishes the temporary Hawaii Port Authority Task Force to review the consolidation of airport and harbor functions and draft necessary implementing legislation.
Title
Port authority; Establishment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=235&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB235_.HTM |