HI HB2342 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Act 022, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the methods by which a consumer may request a security freeze. Specifies that a consumer credit reporting agency shall not charge a fee for placing, lifting, or removing a security freeze on a consumer's credit report or for placing or removing a security freeze on a protected consumer's credit report or records. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Consumer Credit Reporting Agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateAct 022, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
2018-06-06HouseAct 022, on 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
2018-04-26SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 675).
2018-04-25HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-04-25HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Quinlan excused (2).
2018-04-25HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2018-04-25SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 666).
2018-04-24HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-10-18.
2018-04-23HouseThe House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Cullen, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2018-04-19HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:00PM in conference room 229.
2018-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785).
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Ihara, Ruderman.
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Tupola.
2018-04-10SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546).
2018-04-10HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-06SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18.
2018-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2018-04-04SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3418) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2018-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Espero, Nishihara.
2018-03-16SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-18 9:15AM in conference room 229.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to CPH.
2018-03-02SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 94).
2018-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
2018-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-13HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 299-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-02HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Mizuno, Yamane, McDermott.
2018-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-02-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2769 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback