HI HB2336 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Act 019, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows payment of employer contributions to the Employees' Retirement System in advance of the fiscal year in which the contributions are required; provides for interest on and application of the advance payments. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employer Contributions To The Employees' Retirement System.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateAct 019, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
2018-06-06HouseAct 019, on 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1119).
2018-04-30HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-01SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 696).
2018-04-27HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3).
2018-04-27HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2018-04-27SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 690).
2018-04-27SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 684).
2018-04-26HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-12-18.
2018-04-26HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2018-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329.
2018-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
2018-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793).
2018-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; S. Chang.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Holt Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 706) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3550) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani.
2018-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3089) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2018-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to LBR, WAM.
2018-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 213).
2018-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 940-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
2018-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-13HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-13-18 9:45AM in House conference room 309.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2763 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback