HI HB2319 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 251, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 251, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends requirements under the money transmitters law for money transmitter licensee change in control applications, including requiring a criminal history record check on persons who will assume control of the licensee. Updates a reference to federal Regulation E. (SD1)
Title
Money Transmitters; Change in Control; Division of Financial Institutions; Criminal History Record Check
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 251, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 251, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cachola, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-25-16 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 669). |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cachola Co-Chairs; Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 598) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3464) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-31-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2902) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 900-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Brower, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, C. Lee. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-16 at 2:00 pm. |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-08-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2848 (Same As) 2016-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.