HI HB2316 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Health a temporary Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility Defueling Commission to monitor the compliance of the United States Department of Defense or other agencies with any orders or laws relating to the Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility or United States Department of Defense infrastructure involved in the 2021 drinking water contamination event. Establishes a Red Hill Compliance Office to support the Commission. Appropriates moneys. Sunsets on 6/30/2027.
Title
Relating To The Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility Defueling Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH/EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2316&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2316_.HTM |