HI HB2316 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monetary amount an injured homeowner may recover from the Contractors Recovery Fund. Repeals 6/30/2023. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Contractors Recovery Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 214). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2). |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 410-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-30-20 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2872 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.