HI HB2308 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Act 049, 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Act 049, 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides fund authorizations and appropriations for collective bargaining cost items for Unit (11) and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative for fiscal biennium 20152017. (SD1)
Title
Appropriations for Collective Bargaining Cost Items ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Act 049, 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150). |
2016-05-11 | House | Act 049, on 05/10/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2016-04-29 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16. |
2016-04-21 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3541) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2936) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 136). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 736-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 112-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2837 (Same As) 2016-04-19 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:35AM in conference room 325.