HI HB2305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 032, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 032, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the pesticide subsidy program manager position through the fiscal year immediately following the program sunset date. Extends the position's civil service and collective bargaining laws exemption until the expiration of the position. (HB2305 CD1)
Title
Relating To Coffee Berry Borer.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Act 032, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132). |
2018-06-13 | House | Act 032, on 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1132). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 10-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours noticeTuesday, 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 10-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Lowen. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 787). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Johanson, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Holt, Lowen, Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 699) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3683) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2986) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 1:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to AEN/LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 93). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 719-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-15-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 239-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-07-18 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2732 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to AEN/LBR, WAM.