HI HB2301 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain persons to immediately report a potential tort claim to the family court when that person has reason to believe that a child in foster custody has suffered an injury that may arise to a tort claim. Establishes procedures for the family court to follow when appointing a master to investigate a potential tort claim and when authorizing the filing of a tort claim on behalf of an injured child, including the opportunity for an injured child to obtain outside legal representation.
Title
Relating To Family Court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2422 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2301&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2301_.HTM |