HI HB2301 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the objectives of the $50 million sub-fund of the Hawaii green infrastructure special fund to allow state agencies to finance purchase options under existing energy performance contracts and power purchase agreements. Allows state agencies to utilize these savings to finance installation of EV charging systems and the lease or purchase of electric vehicles. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Financing For State Agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2857 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to EET, WAM.