HI HB2301 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOA to develop a food sustainability standard to promote local food production.
Title
Food Sustainability; Department of Agriculture
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-03-12 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2301 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2301_.HTM |