HI HB2299 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to establish permanent or temporary privacy officer and security officer positions in compliance with federal information privacy and security laws. Temporarily exempts the privacy officer and security officer positions from civil service. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB2299 HD2)
Title
Department of Health; Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act; Compliance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 181). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Creagan, Har, C. Lee, Thielen, Woodson excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Ward. |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 5:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 438-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Takayama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-11-14 8:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14 at 8:30am. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-31-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2849 (Same As) 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.