HI HB2298 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-05 - Act 198, 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-05 - Act 198, 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 7/1/2027, requires roasted coffee, instant coffee, and ready-to-drink coffee beverages that contain Hawaii-grown and Hawaii-processed coffee blended with coffee of another regional origin to contain no less than fifty-one per cent coffee by weight from the Hawaii geographic origin. Exempts retailers that do not package roasted coffee, instant coffee, or ready-to-drink coffee beverages from liability for the sale of roasted coffee, instant coffee, or ready-to-drink coffee beverages that use a label or advertisement in violation of the coffee labeling law. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-05 | Senate | Act 198, 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299). |
2024-07-05 | House | Act 198, on 07/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1299). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, Onishi voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 48-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 48-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Gates, Kahaloa, Sayama, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Richards, Rhoads, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 768). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Keohokalole discharged as Chair; Added as Co-Chair. Senator Richards discharged as Member; Added as Chair. |
2024-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2024-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 725). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Richards, Fevella. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Gates Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Sayama, Pierick. |
2024-04-15 | House | Re-referred to CPC, AGR, referral sheet 31 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 572) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3658) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3336) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-21-24 10:30AM; CR 229. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 334). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-20 | House | Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 14 |
2024-02-07 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-09-24 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-09-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2481 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to AEN, CPN.