HI HB2292 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the existing law that bans electric guns, and replaces it with a law that restricts the ownership, use, storage, and disposal of electric guns, regulates the sale, distribution, and transfer of electric guns, requires training and education on electric guns, prohibits certain individuals from the possession and use of electric guns, and prohibits the carrying or use of electric guns in the commission of crimes. Establishes permitting requirement to acquire electric projectile guns and registration requirements. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electric Guns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
2020-07-08HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2020-07-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 594) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-07-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
2020-07-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3736) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-06-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-05-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-05-19SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3555) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto.
2020-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 202).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 925-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane.
2020-02-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-24HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 524-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2848 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback