HI HB2292 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a farm produce dealers special fund. Requires fees for the certification of farm produce dealers and other moneys to be deposited into the special fund. Requires expenditures from the special fund to be made for the farm produce dealers licensure program. Effective January 20, 2020. (HB2292 HD1)
Title
Farm Produce Dealers Special Fund; Establishment
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Michael Magaoay [D] | Rep. Joey Manahan [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, Manahan, McKelvey, Takai, Tokioka, Wakai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Berg, Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 1/29/10 9:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |