HI HB2291 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to WTL, WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to WTL, WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Weights and Measurements Special Fund. Requires the Board of Agriculture to adopt or amend rules to impose or increase fees authorized to be charged under Chapter 486, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to cover the cost of the Measurement Standards Program. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB2291 HD2)
Title
Weights and Measurements Special Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Michael Magaoay [D] |
Rep. Joey Manahan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to WTL, WAM. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 100). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-22-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Pine, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 52-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Wooley, Choy, Evans, Manahan, McKelvey, Takai, Tokioka, Wakai; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Berg, Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 1/29/10 9:00am in House conference room 312. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |