HI HB229 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the fourth day in January of each year as United States Senator Daniel K. Akaka Day. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To United States Senator Daniel K. Akaka Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 494) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback