HI HB2281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Ohana Zones program to provide housing to homeless individuals and families based on principles similar to the housing first program and appropriates unspecified funds for the program. Appropriates unspecified funds to the Department of Human Services and the Department of Health to continue to administer various housing and homelessness programs. Appropriates unspecified funds to the Hawaii Public Housing Authority for public housing improvements and renovations statewide and a housing homeless children pilot program. Establishes and appropriates funds to the Department of Health for an emergency department homelessness assessment pilot program and medical respite pilot program. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 670). |
2018-04-24 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Keohokalole added as Conferee. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 10:10AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Green, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Added: Representative Yamashita added as Conferee. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Brower, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Belatti, Gates, Nakamura, Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 695) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3697) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3177) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Tokuda. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS deferred the measure until 03-20-18 3:05PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 208). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 916-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from HHS/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 380-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS/HSG on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DHS
DOH
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Homelessness
Housing
Housing First
Housing Homeless Children Pilot Program
HPHA
Law Enforcement Assisted Diversion Program
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Oahu Family Assessment Center
Ohana Zones
Outreach
Rapid Rehousing
DHS
DOH
Emergency Department Homelessness Assessment Pilot Program
Homelessness
Housing
Housing First
Housing Homeless Children Pilot Program
HPHA
Law Enforcement Assisted Diversion Program
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Oahu Family Assessment Center
Ohana Zones
Outreach
Rapid Rehousing