HI HB2280 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 133, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 133, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits planned community associations from prohibiting or unreasonably restricting the use of a unit owner's enclosed yard area for personal agriculture, provided that the use is not in violation of the association's existing master landscape plan or other restrictive covenants applicable to the unit. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Real Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 133, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 133, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1234). |
2022-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 12-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 12-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Johanson, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-22 at 5:01PM in Conference Room 225. |
2022-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 9:10AM in conference room 325. |
2022-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Nishihara, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Johanson Co-Chairs; Perruso, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 576). |
2022-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 737) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Inouye). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3754) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-14-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 335). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 932-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, Tarnas. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-25-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 437-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2022-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-11-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |