HI HB2280 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "property" as used in section 28-5.2, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-18-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2809 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2280&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2280_.HTM |