HI HB2277 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 177, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1286).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the East Hawaii Child Welfare Services Section Pilot Project within the Department of Human Services to increase staff in the East Hawaii Child Welfare Services Section. Appropriates funds. (HB2277 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Child Welfare Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11HouseAct 177, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1286).
2018-07-11SenateAct 177, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1286).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 137-18).
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 137-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Shimabukuro, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
2018-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Todd, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
2018-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2018-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2018-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2018-04-19HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
2018-04-19SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Shimabukuro, S. Chang Co-Chairs; Wakai.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Todd Co-Chairs; Learmont, Nakashima, Tupola.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 694) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3606) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani.
2018-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3127) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
2018-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-18 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2018-03-06SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2018-03-02SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 89).
2018-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola.
2018-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-21-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-02-14HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 413-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2018-02-09HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola.
2018-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-09-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback