HI HB227 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB227
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to HTH, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to HTH, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the group of professionals who are prohibited from knowingly referring or transferring patients to an uncertified or unlicensed care facility. Repeals the landlord exclusion. Requires the department of health to prioritize complaint allegations based on severity for inspections of state-licensed or state-certified care facilities. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 847-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB227 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Subjects
Care Facilities
Complaint Allegations
Landlord Exclusion
Uncertified Care Facilities
Unlicensed Care Facilities
Complaint Allegations
Landlord Exclusion
Uncertified Care Facilities
Unlicensed Care Facilities