HI HB2263 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to conduct an economic assessment study on the development and economic viability of a small satellite launch and processing facility on the Island of Hawaii. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Small Satellites; Launch and Processing Facility; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 423. |
2016-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 423. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:30PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:30PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-26-16 2:15PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 2:00PM in conference room 423. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Nishihara, Galuteria Co-Chairs; Espero, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Kong, Onishi, Ward. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 587) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3571) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2947) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EET/PSM, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 132). |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 120-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-05 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Ohno. |
2016-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-16. |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-02-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3107 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.