HI HB225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of education to develop a bullying prevention and response action plan. Requires the board of education to report annually to the legislature. Repeals Act 214, Session Laws of Hawaii 2011. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Bullying.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 202). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco, Perruso, Sayama, Tam; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 586) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB225 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.