HI HB2248 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to adopt state appliance efficiency standards to save consumers' money while conserving energy and water resources. (HB2248 HD1)
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 161-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2935 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.