HI HB2248 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes rules to determine which state has jurisdiction in guardianship and conservatorship cases where person has contacts with more than one state. Effective December 21, 2058. (HB2248 HD1)
Title
Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 93). | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 664-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3). | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 171-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, McKelvey, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Luke, Morita, Thielen. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-26-10 2:30 pm in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2010-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |