HI HB2246 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the state highway enforcement program surcharge from $200 to an unspecified amount. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Highway Enforcement Program Surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 197). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 869-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 442-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-14 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-11-22 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 57-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Takumi. |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |