HI HB2241 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Re-referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain foods, medical services, and feminine hygiene products from the general excise tax.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Re-referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2241&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2241_.HTM |