HI HB2237 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Drug Disposal Program, administered by the Department of the Attorney General, to dispose of prescription and over-the-counter drugs in a safe, secure, and environmentally friendly manner. Establishes the Drug Disposal Special Fund and appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Drug Disposal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 533-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-10HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Nakashima.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-10-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-20 at 2:00PM.
2020-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20 2:00PM.
2020-02-04HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-04-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB3136 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback