HI HB2218 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to HHS/JUD, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the right of certain terminally ill adults to request and access the process of voluntary assisted dying through self-administration or physician administration of a voluntary assisted dying substance. Effective 7/1/2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Voluntary Assisted Dying.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26HouseReferred to HHS/JUD, referral sheet 8
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback