HI HB2217 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act 052, on 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act 052, on 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals various sections of the real property tax laws for the purpose of deleting obsolete and unnecessary provisions. (SD1)
Title
Real Property Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Act 052, on 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153). |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Act 052, 06/06/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1153). |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 658). |
2016-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2). |
2016-04-26 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2016-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-16. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2016-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 489) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Slom, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-16. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3371) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 268). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2016-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |