HI HB2214 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of the Hawaii airports corporation within the department of transportation for administrative purposes. Sets out appointment of members to the board of directors and powers and duties of the Hawaii airport corporation. Transfers the aeronautics functions of DOT to the Hawaii airports corporation by the established transfer completion date agreed upon by Hawaii airports corporation, the director of transportation, and the governor, which shall be no later than July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating To An Airports Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2214&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2214_.HTM |