HI HB2209 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an individual mandate for qualified state taxpayers. Requires all state taxpayers to sign up and maintain health insurance throughout the year or pay a penalty on individual income tax returns. (HB2209 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-09HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2018-02-08HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2018-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2018-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2924 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback