HI HB2206 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii at Manoa for athletics, provided that the Board of Regents considers fiscal matters pertaining to coaching contracts and the termination of certain athletic personnel for cause. Appropriates funds to University of Hawaii at Hilo for athletics. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To An Appropriation For The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 872). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 836) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3929) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 75). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Branco. |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-09-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |