HI HB22 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the fines assessed against noncandidate committees for violations of organizational report requirements. Increases the fines for violations of campaign advertisement notice requirements. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Related To Campaign Finance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 512) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-11-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-02-09HouseReported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 98) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-03HouseThe committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB212 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback