HI HB22 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB22
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires funds appropriated to the University of Hawaii for a specific purpose to be expended for that specific purpose. Requires a report that explains to the Legislature any nonconformity with the specific purpose of an appropriation. Requires unexpended funds to be returned to the general fund.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB22 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=22&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB22_.HTM |