HI HB2199 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to HOU/EET, TRE/WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to HOU/EET, TRE/WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Transit Oriented Development Authority within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to oversee and manage development of infrastructure on state lands within one-quarter mile radius of rail stations.
Title
Transit Oriented Development; Authority; Infrastructure; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EET, TRE/WAM. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 32). |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kong, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 689-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-17 | House | Re-referred to TRN/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2016-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say. |
2016-02-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/WAL on Wednesday, 02-10-16 11:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN/WAL, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2199&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2199_.HTM |